Julie Gorte
Senior Vice President for Sustainable Investment
Washington D.C. Metro AreaInvestment Management
Current
Pax World Management Corp.
Previous
Ceres, Calvert Mutual Funds, Calvert Group
Education
Michigan State University
500+
connections
www.linkedin.com/pub/julie-gorte/0/8ab/927
Background
Summary
I oversee Pax World's environmental, social, and governance research and the integration of this research with financial research for investment purposes. I also oversee Pax's shareowner advocacy and public policy advocacy.
Specialties:sustainable investment
socially responsible investment
Experience
Senior Vice President for Sustainable Investment
Pax World Management Corp.
April 2007 – Present (6 years 1 month)
Board Member
Ceres
2002 – 2009 (7 years)
Vice President and Chief Social Investment Strategist
Calvert Mutual Funds
2006 – 2007 (1 year)
Chief Social Investment Strategist
Calvert Group
2005 – 2007 (2 years)
Chief Social Investment Strategist
Calvert
1999 – 2007 (8 years)
Senior Analyst
Northeast-Midwest Institute
1998 – 1999 (1 year)
Program Manager for Technology
US EPA
1997 – 1998 (1 year)
Vice President
The Wilderness Society
1994 – 1996 (2 years)
Education
Michigan State University
Ph.D, resource economics
1976 – 1980
Northern Arizona University
Bachelor of Science
1972 – 1976
Recommendations Given (5)
Shari Friedman
Senior Policy Analyst
Shari is everything I like working with: smart, efficient, organized, thoughtful, and she knows not only how to analyze but how to synthesize large amounts of data. She is also a delightful person, a pleasure to be with at work or away from work. She has a sense of humor and a sense of seriousness. If I could work with her again, I would be delighted.
January 15, 2013, Julie managed Shari at US EPA
Karin Chamberlain
Sustainable Business Professional
I worked with Karin as we managed a project to construct a draft index for a multilateral organization. She is thoughtful, smart, organized, quick, and creative. Her presentation of the results was thorough, but still efficient and brief. I would welcome the opportunity to work with her again. I have rarely had as pleasant an experience with a colleague.
January 27, 2011, Julie worked with Karin at Boston, MA
Hind Aloul
Intern
Hind was a pleasure to to work with. She was thoughtful, quick, followed up all suggestions, and knowledgeable. I would be happy to work with Hind again.
January 26, 2011, Julie managed Hind at Calvert Group , Maryland, US.
Toni Brown
Executive Assistant
Toni was conscientious, thorough, and attentive to details. She was a pleasure to work with, both pleasant and utterly reliable.
February 2, 2009, Julie managed Toni at Calvert Group
Rob Perry
Network Systems and Security Manager
Rob is a wonderful colleague: he is helpful, thoughtful, knowledgeable, and unfailingly polite. He is also funny and charming, and therefore a delight to be around whether in a work context or not. I have taken several fairly quirky and unusual IT problems to him, and he has never failed to solve them, quickly and cheerfully. He is also an acquirer of information: he reads...more
July 24, 2007, Julie worked with Rob at Calvert
See More
ConnectionsShared (4)
Toby Webb1st
Founder, Ethical Corporation and Stakeholder Intelligence
Montashir QUB1st
Compliance Auditor at OTTO Intl (HK) Ltd
Lance Lindblom1st
Retired as President & CEO, Trustee, of The Nathan Cummings Foundation
Alice Tepper Marlin1st
President, Social Accountability International (SAI)
PREVIOUSNEXT
Groups
85 Broads
Join
Association of Climate Change Officers
Join
Carbon War Room
Join
CommentVisions
Join
Corporate Social Responsibility
Join
ESG Investing
Join
European Corporate Governance Forum
Join
See 13 more
Following
The Journal of Environmental Investing
Investment Management
|